Global Patent Index - EP 0938916 A3

EP 0938916 A3 2000-03-01 - Skate

Title (en)

Skate

Title (de)

Schlittschuh

Title (fr)

Patin

Publication

EP 0938916 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99850016 A

Priority

SE 9800277 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938916A2] A skate comprising a blade (1) with an edge (2) and a longitudinal side edge (3) arranged opposite to the edge, an essentially T-shaped section element (4) fixed to the blade adjacent to and along the longitudinal side edge, a rear fastening (7) releasably fixed to the section element and a releasably fixed front fastening (8), said fastenings being adapted, in coaction, to releasably fix a boot (23) to the skate. The invention is characterised in that the fastenings (7, 8) are arranged on at least one fixing plate (9, 11) with a T groove (12) which extends along the longitudinal axis (13) of the entire fixing plate and which, with a play, encloses the outermost end portions (17) of the section element, which are positioned in parallel with the blade, whereby the fixing plate (9, 11) is displaceable with a sliding fit along the section element (4), and that each fixing plate (9, 11) has a locking means (21, 22) which cooperates with the circumferential surface (16) of the section element (4) for essentially infinitely variable adjustment of the fastenings (7, 8) along the longitudinal side edge (3) of the blade (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 1/08; A63C 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938916 A2 19990901; EP 0938916 A3 20000301; SE 513686 C2 20001023; SE 9800277 D0 19980130; SE 9800277 L 19990731

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040423

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63C 1/08 A, 7A 63C 1/26 B

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI NL

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI