Global Patent Index - EP 0938918 A3

EP 0938918 A3 2000-11-29 - Score card for the game of tombola and similar games

Title (en)

Score card for the game of tombola and similar games

Title (de)

Spielstandkarte für Tombola- und ähnliche Spiele

Title (fr)

Carte de score pour jeu de tombola et jeux similaires

Publication

EP 0938918 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200178 A

Priority

IT RE980007 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938918A2] On a score-card for the game of TOMBOLA and similar games, comprising a sheet (A) on which numerical signs (B) (and/or letters, symbols, figures) for the game are printed, with each numerical sign (B) (and/or letter, symbol, figure) there is associated, as a marker, a small area (F, G) of a thin layer of coating of the type which, if scratched, is removed with relative ease, said coating area (F, G) having a graphical appearance which is visually conspicuous compared with that region of the sheet (A) on which it is positioned. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/061 (2013.01); A63F 3/062 (2013.01); A63F 3/0665 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938918 A2 19990901; EP 0938918 A3 20001129; IT 245217 Y1 20020320; IT RE980007 U1 19990728

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI