Global Patent Index - EP 0938938 A3

EP 0938938 A3 2001-04-04 - Multiple tool

Title (en)

Multiple tool

Title (de)

Mehrfachwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil multiple

Publication

EP 0938938 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103542 A

Priority

DE 19808399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938938A2] The machine has punches (38) with guides (36), and guide elements (32) with holders (60) between them. These transmit an axial force between punches and guides, which is larger than the weight of the punches. The holding force of the holders is overcome by the forces active during punching and return movements. The holders are formed by locking elements on punches or guides, which in rest position form a positive connection between punches and guides, and deflect radially during a punching movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/12 (2013.01); B21D 28/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938938 A2 19990901; EP 0938938 A3 20010404; DE 19808399 C1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011005

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATE PRECISION TOOLING INC.

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI