Global patent index - EP 0938950 A3

EP 0938950 A3 2000-04-05 - Abrasive tape

Title (en)

Abrasive tape

Title (de)

Schleifband

Title (fr)

Bande abrasive

Publication

EP 0938950 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105023 A

Priority

  • EP 99105023 A
  • EP 93913473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938951A2] The grinding tape (11) consists of a film substrate (2) and a grinding layer (10) laminated on one surface. It has a plurality of recesses (9) in the surface of the grinding layer (10), a film substrate (2) is wound partially around the circumferential surface of a roll intaglio (1) provided with several recesses (5) in its surface. The film substrate (2) is fed as the roll intaglio (1) is rotated. In the meantime, an ionising radiation setting resin (3) is fed between the roll intaglio (1) and the film substrate (2) passed around it, in such a manner that the resin (3) is shaped by the recesses (5) to cause recesses (9) to be formed in the surface of the resin (3). During the shaping of the resin (3), the radiation R is applied from an ionising radiation source (8) to the resin (3) so as to harden the resin (3) and combine the resin (3) and film substrate (2) with each other unitarily. A grinding tape (11) thus obtained is peeled off from the roll intaglio (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/02 (2006.01); B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/08 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 18/009 (2013.01); B24D 3/02 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 11/00 (2013.01); B24D 11/001 (2013.01); B24D 11/006 (2013.01); B24D 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938951 A2 19990901; EP 0938951 A3 20000405; EP 0938951 B1 20020904; EP 0938950 A2 19990901; EP 0938950 A3 20000405; EP 0938950 B1 20030319; EP 0940224 A2 19990908; EP 0940224 A3 20000405; EP 0940224 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-06-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130601

2013-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-06-12 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20130602

2013-06-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69332790

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69332790

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2003-03-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0664187

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NISHIO, TOSHIKAZU

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AMEMIA, HIROYUKI

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAI, YASUO

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISHII, TAIJI

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, MASAHISA

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NISHIO, TOSHIKAZU

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AMENIA, HIROYUKI

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAI, YASUO

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISHII, TAIJI

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, MASAHISA

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 664187

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL