Global Patent Index - EP 0938951 A3

EP 0938951 A3 2000-04-05 - Method of producing an abrasive tape

Title (en)

Method of producing an abrasive tape

Title (de)

Schleifband-Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une bande adhésive

Publication

EP 0938951 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105025 A

Priority

EP 93913473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938951A2] The grinding tape (11) consists of a film substrate (2) and a grinding layer (10) laminated on one surface. It has a plurality of recesses (9) in the surface of the grinding layer (10), a film substrate (2) is wound partially around the circumferential surface of a roll intaglio (1) provided with several recesses (5) in its surface. The film substrate (2) is fed as the roll intaglio (1) is rotated. In the meantime, an ionising radiation setting resin (3) is fed between the roll intaglio (1) and the film substrate (2) passed around it, in such a manner that the resin (3) is shaped by the recesses (5) to cause recesses (9) to be formed in the surface of the resin (3). During the shaping of the resin (3), the radiation R is applied from an ionising radiation source (8) to the resin (3) so as to harden the resin (3) and combine the resin (3) and film substrate (2) with each other unitarily. A grinding tape (11) thus obtained is peeled off from the roll intaglio (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/02 (2006.01); B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/08 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 18/009 (2013.01); B24D 3/02 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 11/00 (2013.01); B24D 11/001 (2013.01); B24D 11/006 (2013.01); B24D 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938951 A2 19990901; EP 0938951 A3 20000405; EP 0938951 B1 20020904; EP 0938950 A2 19990901; EP 0938950 A3 20000405; EP 0938950 B1 20030319; EP 0940224 A2 19990908; EP 0940224 A3 20000405; EP 0940224 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130604

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-06-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130601

2013-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-06-12 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20130602

2013-06-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69332280

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.

- Free text: DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.#1-1, ICHIGAYA-KAGA-CHO 1-CHOME SHINJUKU-KU#TOKYO 162-01 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.#1-1, ICHIGAYA-KAGA-CHO 1-CHOME SHINJUKU-KU#TOKYO 162-01 (JP)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69332280 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 664187

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NISHIO, TOSHIKAZU

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AMEMIYA, HIROYUKI

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAKAI, YASUO

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHII, TAIJI

2001-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, MASAHISA

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 24D 11/00 A

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NISHIO, TOSHIKAZU

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AMEMIYA, HIROYUKI

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAKAI, YASUO

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISHII, TALJI

1999-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMAGUCHI, MASAHISA

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 664187

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL