Global Patent Index - EP 0938975 A3

EP 0938975 A3 2000-02-23 - Apparatus and method for image fusing

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for image fusing

Title (de)

Apparat und Verfahren zum Schmelzfixieren von Bildern

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de fusion d'images

Publication

EP 0938975 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301400 A

Priority

  • US 6252198 A
  • US 4521698 A
  • US 3067298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0938975A2] A method of offset printing in an ink jet printer (10), the method comprising the steps of: (a) forming an ink image on a preliminary receiving surface (9); (b) passing a final receiving substrate (11) through a first nip (32) where it comes into contact with the preliminary receiving surface (9); (c) exerting a first pressure on the final receiving substrate (11) in the first nip (32) to transfer the ink image from the preliminary receiving surface (9) to the final receiving substrate (11); (d) passing the final receiving substrate (11) through a second nip (39); and (e) exerting a second pressure on the final receiving substrate (11) in the second nip (39) to fuse the ink image into the final receiving substrate (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/01; B41J 2/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/005 (2006.01); B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/155 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14016 (2013.01); B41J 2/0057 (2013.01); B41J 2/01 (2013.01); B41J 2/155 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41J 2/17593 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0938975 A2 19990901; EP 0938975 A3 20000223; EP 0938975 B1 20071219; DE 69937767 D1 20080131; DE 69937767 T2 20080430

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150225

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150225

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69937767

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-09-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080922

2008-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937767 P 20080131

2007-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2007-12-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEROX CORPORATION

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/01 A, 7B 41J 2/005 B

1999-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEKTRONIX, INC.

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI