Global Patent Index - EP 0939050 A3

EP 0939050 A3 2000-05-10 - Device for taking a sample in a delivery device of a sheet printing machine

Title (en)

Device for taking a sample in a delivery device of a sheet printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Probebogenentnahme an einem Ausleger einer Bogendruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de prélèvement d'échantillon dans un dispositif de sortie d'une machine à imprimer des feuilles

Publication

EP 0939050 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102997 A

Priority

DE 19808309 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939050A2] The sheet stop moves from a stop position on the sheet stack into a removal position for taking sample sheets. On the sheet high holder (12) is an engagement protection (14) which moves over the sheet stack (4). The engagement protection extends between the sheet conveyor device and the engagement area along the sheet stop and during sample sheet removal along the front edge of the sheet stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/70 (2006.01); B65H 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/585 (2013.01); B65H 29/041 (2013.01); B65H 2404/725 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939050 A2 19990901; EP 0939050 A3 20000510; EP 0939050 B1 20020410; AT 215904 T 20020415; DE 19808309 A1 19990902; JP H11286098 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-02-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-02-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040216

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030208

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901159 20020516

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215904 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 29/58 A, 7B 41F 33/00 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI