Global Patent Index - EP 0939152 B1

EP 0939152 B1 2001-03-14 - Procedure for producing a twisted yarn in an integrated spinning and twisting process using the two-for-one principle, as well as a device to carry out the procedure

Title (en)

Procedure for producing a twisted yarn in an integrated spinning and twisting process using the two-for-one principle, as well as a device to carry out the procedure

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zwirns in einem integrierten Spinn-Zwirnprozess nach dem Doppeldrahtprinzip sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer un retors dans un processus filature-torsion d'après le principle à double torsion ainsi que dispositif pour réaliser le processus

Publication

EP 0939152 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121675 A

Priority

DE 19807981 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807981C1] Two spinning rotors (1,2) within the two-for-one twister produce feed yarns (F1,F2) which pass through a hollow spindle (11) and flier arm (3) to give a twisted two-ply yarn (F3). The yarn balloon passes directly through the pneumatically conveyed fiber feed from feed channels (4.1,4.2) in the annular space (10). Suction (L3) is applied through the hollow drive shaft (23) and induces an airflow across the annular space (10). Annular seals (14.1,14.2) and a cover (12.4) prevent air bypassing the feed duct (6.1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 7/90; D01H 4/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/10 (2006.01); D01H 1/00 (2006.01); D01H 4/00 (2006.01); D01H 4/04 (2006.01); D01H 4/38 (2006.01); D01H 7/02 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D01H 7/88 (2006.01); D01H 7/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/90 (2013.01); D01H 4/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807981 C1 19990506; CN 1232890 A 19991027; CZ 9900648 A3 19990915; EP 0939152 A2 19990901; EP 0939152 A3 19991229; EP 0939152 B1 20010314; JP H11279848 A 19991012; US 6047537 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011211

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011122

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800531 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKMANN GMBH

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI