Global Patent Index - EP 0939156 A3

EP 0939156 A3 2001-05-16 - Method and device for the pneumatic threading of textile machine weft feeders

Title (en)

Method and device for the pneumatic threading of textile machine weft feeders

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur pneumatischen Einfädelung eines Schussfadenzubringers

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'enfilage d'un fournisseur de trame

Publication

EP 0939156 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99102773 A

Priority

IT TO980152 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939156A2] A method for the pneumatic threading of weft feeders (10) comprising a fixed drum (11), a hollow driving shaft (13), a hollow windmilling arm (12) which winds the thread onto the drum, braking means (14) and a final thread guiding ring (15). The method comprises the steps of: providing the feeder (10) with a first pneumatic element (18) and with a second pneumatic element (20) which are located at the infeed of the driving shaft (13) and at the output (15) of the feeder, respectively, and selectively activating the pneumatic elements in order to obtain the partial threading of the front part of the feeder (10) only, by guiding the thread (F) through the braking means (14) and the final thread guiding ring (15), or the partial threading of the rear part of the feeder (10) only, by activating the first pneumatic element (20) in order to guide the thread from the infeed of the driving shaft (13) to the base of the drum (11) through the windmilling arm (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/16 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01); B65H 51/16 (2013.01); B65H 57/003 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939156 A2 19990901; EP 0939156 A3 20010516; EP 0939156 B1 20041103; DE 69921524 D1 20041209; DE 69921524 T2 20051027; IT 1302068 B1 20000720; IT TO980152 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170223

2018-02-22 [REG BE MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170228

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69921524

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170228

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150224

2015-09-29 [REG SE EUG] EP PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921524 P 20041209

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI SE

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE IT LI SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI