Global Patent Index - EP 0939186 B1

EP 0939186 B1 2001-12-05 - Hinge for doors, windows and the like

Title (en)

Hinge for doors, windows and the like

Title (de)

Band für Türen, Fenster und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes, fenêtres et similaires.

Publication

EP 0939186 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109815 A

Priority

  • DE 29510215 U
  • EP 96109661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0750088A1] One hinge plate part (10) is fixed to the fixed frame, and the other hinge plate part (20), partly over it, is fixed to the window casement or door leaf part. The superimposed parts (2, 12) have cavities (3, 13) for the hinge plate journals determining the hinge axis and containing a journal (5). Clamps clamping the journal at right angles to its axis on the casement's or leaf's plane against the inner periphery of the cavity comprise a wedge (18) exerting force parallel to the journal's axial direction. The wedge is screwed (19) into an axially parallel groove (8) in the journal's peripheral surface, and has a radially outward pointing determinating surface (23). The opposite wedge surface (22) co-operates with the wedge groove's base surface (9) sloping in relation to the axis of the journal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/12; E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 7/00 (2006.01); E05D 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0027 (2013.01); E05D 5/0246 (2013.01); E05D 5/12 (2013.01); E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05D 7/0045 (2013.01); E05D 5/16 (2013.01); E05D 7/0054 (2013.01); E05D 2007/0081 (2013.01); E05D 2011/0072 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29510215 U1 19961024; AT 195573 T 20000915; AT 210237 T 20011215; DK 0750088 T3 20001227; DK 0939186 T3 20020402; EP 0750088 A1 19961227; EP 0750088 B1 20000816; EP 0939186 A1 19990901; EP 0939186 B1 20011205; ES 2150051 T3 20001116; ES 2165213 T3 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAHN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050618

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050617

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-06-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-06-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050617

2005-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050617

2004-06-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20010402175

2002-03-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165213 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608395 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 750088

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210237 T 20011215

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

1999-09-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 750088

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE