Global Patent Index - EP 0939189 A3

EP 0939189 A3 2000-05-31 - Remote control door mechanisms

Title (en)

Remote control door mechanisms

Title (de)

Fernbedienungstürmechanismus

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de commande à distance pour porte

Publication

EP 0939189 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301396 A

Priority

GB 9803971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2344138A] A driving mechanism for a canopy-type up-and-over door has:- driven means for capturing a door bolt and moving the door via the bolt between closed and part-open positions; means for detecting when the door is in the part-open position; and driven means for rotating a counterbalance shaft to move the door between part-open and open positions. Horizontal, endless chain 35 engages and holds upper door bolt 41. The motor-driven chain bodily moves the bolt, and thus moves the door to the part-open position. The chain then disengages bolt 41 while the bolt allows lever 39, detecting the part-open position, to pivot to engage a clutch with the counterbalance shaft. The same motor then rotates the shaft to a door-open position. The chain in reverse completes door closing by engaging the bolt, while disengaging the clutch. The chain and shaft may be separately driven.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16; E05D 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E05D 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/684 (2013.01); E05D 13/1261 (2013.01); E05D 15/445 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 0004019 D0 20000412; GB 2344138 A 20000531; GB 2344138 B 20001004; EP 0939189 A2 19990901; EP 0939189 A3 20000531; GB 2334750 A 19990901; GB 9803971 D0 19980422

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR IE IT NL SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI