Global patent index - EP 0939191 A3

EP 0939191 A3 2000-06-07 - Louvre window

Title (en)

Louvre window

Title (de)

Lamellenfenster

Title (fr)

Fenêtre à lamelles

Publication

EP 0939191 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102381 A

Priority

DE 29802551 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939191A2] The outer and inner frames comprise four one-part profile components, which have two areas of metal, which at least in the outer frame are connected by an area of thermal insulating material. Between the glass lamellas and the profile components of the inner frame a seal of profile rubber encloses the glass lamellas. A slide bearing (8) is used, comprising a pin (9) of metal and a bearing bush (10) of plastic. It is laterally pressed by a spring (11). The pivot movement of the lamellas is activated by an operating device (12), which has a rod (12.1) arranged on a vertical arm of the outer arm with a guide, and on which devices are fitted with which the lift movement of the rod is converted into a pivot movement of the inner frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 7/086

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/086 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802551 U1 19980604; EP 0939191 A2 19990901; EP 0939191 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020122

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB GR IE IT LU

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI