Global Patent Index - EP 0939223 A3

EP 0939223 A3 2000-05-03 - Transfer pump

Title (en)

Transfer pump

Title (de)

Förderpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe de transfert

Publication

EP 0939223 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98310488 A

Priority

GB 9804114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939223A2] A transfer pump for use with a high pressure pump having a rotary drive member (10) and a stationary part (16), comprises a plurality of pumping elements (26) reciprocable within bores (24) provided in the drive member (10), the bores (24) extending generally parallel to the axis of rotation of the drive member (10), the pumping elements (26) being reciprocable under the influence of a cam surface (28) defined by a surface of the stationary part (16) of the high pressure pump, the pumping elements (26) being biased towards the cam surface (28), and valve means associated with the bores (24) controlling the flow of the fuel to and from the bores (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20; F04B 23/06; F02M 37/04; F02M 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/043 (2013.01); F04B 1/20 (2013.01); F04B 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939223 A2 19990901; EP 0939223 A3 20000503; GB 9804114 D0 19980422

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/20 A, 7F 04B 23/06 B, 7F 02M 37/04 B, 7F 02M 39/00 B

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUCAS INDUSTRIES LIMITED

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI