Global Patent Index - EP 0939225 A3

EP 0939225 A3 2000-06-14 - Power control circuit for a plurality of hydrostatic variable displacement pumps

Title (en)

Power control circuit for a plurality of hydrostatic variable displacement pumps

Title (de)

Leistungsregeleinrichtung für mehrere verstellbare Hydropumpen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de puissance pour plusieurs pompes hydrostatiques à débit variable

Publication

EP 0939225 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103324 A

Priority

DE 19808127 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939225A2] The arrangement has a hyperbolic regulator which acts via a pivoting lever on a control pressure valve (10) and an engagement element (17) which can slide on the lever so that the lever arm, with which the engagement element engages the lever, can be varied, whereby the engagement element is subjected to the working pressures in the working lines (6, 7). Separate displacement devices (4, 5) are provided for each pump (2, 3). The regulator (1) is a separate valve unit. The control pressure valve (10) regulates a control pressure that is fed to the displacement device and to both pumps to adjust the delivery volume. The lever arm is fixed by a first control element (21) connected to the control pressure line. The control pressure valve is also acted upon by electromagnets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/08; F04B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/002 (2013.01); F04B 49/08 (2013.01); F04B 2205/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939225 A2 19990901; EP 0939225 A3 20000614; EP 0939225 B1 20050427; DE 19808127 A1 19990909; DE 19808127 C2 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090220

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090219

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090219

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-10-13 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911964 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI