Global Patent Index - EP 0939233 A3

EP 0939233 A3 2001-12-05 - Force multiplier

Title (en)

Force multiplier

Title (de)

Kraftverstärker

Title (fr)

Multiplicateur de force

Publication

EP 0939233 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103719 A

Priority

DE 19808301 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808301A1] The increaser is located in front of the pressure medium piston (2), within the same cylinder, moving with the piston (2). The counter bearing (11) is in a force fit at the wall of the cylinder (1), as a collet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/20; F16H 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2006.01); F15B 3/00 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/204 (2013.01); F15B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808301 A1 19980910; EP 0939233 A2 19990901; EP 0939233 A3 20011205; JP H11287202 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 15B 15/20 A, 7F 16H 25/18 B

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI