Global patent index - EP 0939251 A3

EP 0939251 A3 2000-02-02 - Shift-lever devices

Title (en)

Shift-lever devices

Title (de)

Schalthebel

Title (fr)

Levier de commande de changement de vitesse

Publication

EP 0939251 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123768 A

Priority

  • JP 4703598 A
  • JP 4703698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939251A2] A shift-lever device includes a position plate (17) integrated with a base plate (14) and formed with a detent groove (18), a shift lever (1) supported to the base plate to be swingable along the position plate and including a base (7) arranged adjacent to the position plate, and a compression rod (2) arranged through the shift lever to axially be movable by operation of a knob button (11). A detent protrusion (3) is arranged with the compression rod at a lower end to be engageable with the detent groove. A guide (7a) integrated with the base of the shift lever holds part of the detent protrusion longitudinally with respect to a vehicle body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 59/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 59/10 (2006.01); F16H 61/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 59/10 (2013.01); F16H 61/22 (2013.01); F16H 2059/0282 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19688 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939251 A2 19990901; EP 0939251 A3 20000202; EP 0939251 B1 20030502; DE 69814030 D1 20030605; DE 69814030 T2 20031127; US 6189398 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69814030

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KATAUMI, YOSHIMASA, C/O WASHIZU PLANT OF FUJI KIKO

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FUJIWARA, RYOICHI, C/O WASHIZU PLANT OF FUJI KIKO

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981214

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI