Global Patent Index - EP 0939272 A3

EP 0939272 A3 2001-03-28 - Device for creating lighting effects in discotheques

Title (en)

Device for creating lighting effects in discotheques

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von Lichteffekten für Diskotheken.

Title (fr)

Dispositif à effets lumineux pour discothèques

Publication

EP 0939272 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830753 A

Priority

IT PR980012 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939272A2] The invention falls within the sector of devices for creating lighting effects in discotheques. Two rotating assemblies (2) and (3) intended to produce two rotational movements, perpendicular to one another, of a mirror (26) are joined to a fixing plate (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21P 5/02; F21V 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21W 2131/406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939272 A2 19990901; EP 0939272 A3 20010328; IT 1306036 B1 20010529; IT PR980012 A1 19990825

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21P 5/02 A, 7F 21V 17/02 B

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI