Global Patent Index - EP 0939290 A3

EP 0939290 A3 2001-01-17 - Training device for an armoured vehicle carrying a large calibre gun, in particular a howitzer

Title (en)

Training device for an armoured vehicle carrying a large calibre gun, in particular a howitzer

Title (de)

Ausbildungseinrichtung für ein Kampffahrzeug mit einer schweren Waffe, insbesondere für eine Panzerhaubitze

Title (fr)

Dispostif d'entraînement pour un véhicule blindé muni d'une arme à grand calibre, notamment un obusier

Publication

EP 0939290 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103149 A

Priority

DE 19807976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939290A2] At the free end of the short tube (1) is a magazine (2) for practice ammunition (16.1). The practice ammunition has the same weight and dimensions as real ammunition and in the area of their front part have devices for engagement of a brake device (13,14) in the magazine. An ammunition removal aid is provided with removes the practice ammunition from the magazine with a frame running on rollers, which supports a work platform for operating personnel. On the platform is a hydraulically raisable and lowerable lift vehicle for accommodating the practice ammunition and lowering it to ground level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 33/00 (2006.01); F42B 8/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/12 (2013.01); F41A 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807976 A1 19990826; EP 0939290 A2 19990901; EP 0939290 A3 20010117; EP 0939290 B1 20030521; ES 2200419 T3 20040301; NO 317841 B1 20041220; NO 990875 A 19990828; NO 990875 D0 19990224; US 6161461 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200419 T3

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402502

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905602 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB GR IT NL

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI FR GB GR IT NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB GR IT NL

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI