Global Patent Index - EP 0939330 A3

EP 0939330 A3 2000-02-23 - Plasma addressed display device

Title (en)

Plasma addressed display device

Title (de)

Plasmaadressierte Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage adressé par plasma

Publication

EP 0939330 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99103217 A

Priority

JP 5620798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939330A2] Disclosed is a plasma addressed display device characterized in that a plurality of scanning electrodes are formed in each discharge channel, wherein discharge is generated by applying selective pulses in sequence to the plurality of scanning electrodes allocated to each discharge channel, whereby each of the number of the scanning electrodes and the number of partition walls can be reduced in at least half to thereby enhance the opening ratio, as compared with a related art plasma addressed display device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/133; G02F 1/1343; G09G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/133 (2006.01); G09G 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3662 (2013.01); G02F 1/13334 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] EP 0500084 A2 19920826 - SONY CORP [JP]
  • [YA] HAYASHI M ET AL: "23.2: DEVELOPMENT OF 25-IN. PLASMA-ADDRESSED LCD FOR MULTIMEDIA APPLICATIONS", SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS,US,SANTA ANA, SID, vol. 28, pages 383-386, XP000722724, ISSN: 0097-966X
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 096 (P - 1694) 16 February 1994 (1994-02-16)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 054 (P - 1480) 3 February 1993 (1993-02-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 3 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939330 A2 19990901; EP 0939330 A3 20000223; CN 1124585 C 20031015; CN 1233037 A 19991027; US 6326937 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021106

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI