Global Patent Index - EP 0939350 A3

EP 0939350 A3 2000-08-09 - Chain drive unit for the weight drive a clock

Title (en)

Chain drive unit for the weight drive a clock

Title (de)

Kettenradbaugruppe für den Gewichtsantrieb einer Uhr

Title (fr)

Unité d'entraînement par roue à chaînes pour l'entraînement par poids pour une horloge

Publication

EP 0939350 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102344 A

Priority

DE 29802806 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939350A2] The chain drive unit is provided for the weight drive of the rotary mechanism and/or striking mechanism of a clock. The unit has a chain drive arranged on a shaft between two coaxial profile plates. The chain drive is in rotary connection with a toothed drive wheel fixed axially on the shaft, via a directional lock, in the drive rotary direction. The two profile plates are pressed in the axial direction against the drive wheel by a spring. The chain drive (22) and the first profile plate (20) between the chain drive and the drive wheel (7) are connected together by a coupling element (14) such that they cannot rotate at least in the drive direction. This profile plate (20) has at least one axially movable spring (31-34) which engages in a collar (9) of the drive wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 1/08; G04B 1/02; G04B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 1/02 (2006.01); G04B 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 1/02 (2013.01); G04B 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802806 U1 19980416; EP 0939350 A2 19990901; EP 0939350 A3 20000809; US 6126308 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020829

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI