Global Patent Index - EP 0939410 A3

EP 0939410 A3 2000-07-26 - Thermistor manufacturing process and application of thermistor as current limiter

Title (en)

Thermistor manufacturing process and application of thermistor as current limiter

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Kaltleiteranordnung sowie Verwendung der Kaltleiteranordnung als Strombegrenzer

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'une thermistance et son application comme dispositif de limitation de courant

Publication

EP 0939410 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810105 A

Priority

DE 19808025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939410A2] A cold conductor structure is produced by fixing an insulating ceramic plate (1) to each side of a positive temperature coefficient of resistance (PTC) metal layer (2) with a solder or adhesive layer (3). Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) a cold conductor structure produced as described above, the ratio of the total cross-sectional area of the solder or adhesive layers to the cross-sectional area of the metal layer being less than 4/5, especially 0.12; and (ii) a current limiter consisting solely of the above cold conductor structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/084 (2006.01); H01C 1/14 (2006.01); H01C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/02 (2013.01); H01C 1/084 (2013.01); H01C 1/1406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939410 A2 19990901; EP 0939410 A3 20000726; DE 19808025 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050426

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI