Global Patent Index - EP 0939577 A3

EP 0939577 A3 2001-01-10 - Loudspeaker pressure plate

Title (en)

Loudspeaker pressure plate

Title (de)

Druckplatte für Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Plaque de pression pour haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0939577 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98307296 A

Priority

US 3231798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939577A2] An apparatus (84) for mounting a loudspeaker (50) within an enclosure (30) is disclosed. The apparatus (84) includes a loudspeaker mounting plate (34) formed within the enclosure (30), and a mounting boss (40) formed within the enclosure (30) which is separated from the loudspeaker mounting plate (34) by a fixed distance. The loudspeaker (50) includes a first surface (54) for engaging the loudspeaker mounting plate (34) and a second surface (62) disposed opposite the first surface (54). A pressure plate (70) is disposed between the second surface (62) of the loudspeaker (50) and the mounting boss (40). An axial force member (80) is associated with the pressure plate (70), and the axial force member (80) is operable for applying a force between the pressure plate (70) and the mounting boss (40) for securing the loudspeaker (50) between the loudspeaker mounting plate (34) and the mounting boss (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/02; G10K 11/178; H04R 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/025 (2013.01); F01N 1/065 (2013.01); H04R 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939577 A2 19990901; EP 0939577 A3 20010110; US 6005957 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040928

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04R 9/02 A, 7H 04R 1/02 B, 7G 10K 11/178 B

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI