Global Patent Index - EP 0939581 A3

EP 0939581 A3 2001-04-11 - Lamp arrangement and lamp unit for use in the lamp arrangement

Title (en)

Lamp arrangement and lamp unit for use in the lamp arrangement

Title (de)

Leuchtenanordnung und Leuchtmitteleinheit zur Verwendung in einer solchen Leuchtenanordnung

Title (fr)

Arrangement d'éclairage et unité de lampe à utliser dans ledit arrangement d'éclairage

Publication

EP 0939581 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103346 A

Priority

DE 29803299 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939581A2] The arrangement includes a number of electrically with each other connected lighting units which are arranged in a spatial distance with respect to each other at, or in a carrier, and which are commonly activated. At least two of the units are respectively associated with a voltage converter unit (10, 14) which is placed along with a lighting device (20) in a casing of the unit. The lighting units are supplied over a common conductor (26) with a line voltage. The voltage converter unit is preferably a low-voltage ballast circuit for a halogen light.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/00; F21V 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/02 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/02 (2013.01); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/04 (2013.01); F21V 23/0442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803299 U1 19980528; EP 0939581 A2 19990901; EP 0939581 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 23/00 20060101ALI20141013BHEP

2014-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 37/00 20060101AFI20141013BHEP

2001-12-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011022

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI