Global Patent Index - EP 0939634 A4

EP 0939634 A4 2001-02-21 - IL-8 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

IL-8 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

IL-8 REZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR IL-8

Publication

EP 0939634 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97938426 A

Priority

  • US 9714582 W
  • US 2397296 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806398A1] This invention relates to novel compounds of formula (I), and compositions thereof, useful in the treatment of disease states mediated by the chemokine, interleukin-8(IL-8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44; A61K 31/495; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/535; C07D 211/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/42 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/72 (2006.01); C07D 213/75 (2006.01); C07D 239/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/75 (2013.01); C07D 239/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806398 A1 19980219; EP 0939634 A1 19990908; EP 0939634 A4 20010221; JP 2000516620 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1022430

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-02-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/44 A, 7A 61K 31/495 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B, 7A 61K 31/535 B, 7C 07D 211/56 B

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990212

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL