Global Patent Index - EP 0939699 B1

EP 0939699 B1 2001-12-19 - PRINTING METHOD

Title (en)

PRINTING METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 0939699 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948698 A

Priority

  • DE 9702535 W
  • DE 19644950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818624A1] The invention relates to a method for printing the front and the reverse side of a sheet. The invention provides a method for printing the front side of the sheet and subsequent printing of the reverse side thereof without requiring great mechanical and technical means or excessive handling. According to the invention, this is performed in that the sheet to be printed is taken out of the sheet feed pile (1), passed on to the sheet guide cylinder (4) to print the reverse side of the sheet. Once the reverse side of the sheet is printed, it is forwarded to the sheet exit pile (11) in the direction opposite to the running direction of the sheet towards the sheet guide cylinder (4), by a sheet transporting device (15). It is then deposited in the sheet exit pile (11) placed before the sheet feed pile in an equal plane relative to the running direction (14) of the sheet, the printed reverse side facing upwards. The sheet exit pile (11) can be brought to the position of the sheet feed pile for consecutive printing of the front side of the sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/10; B41F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/00 (2013.01); B41F 7/10 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818624 A1 19980507; EP 0939699 A1 19990908; EP 0939699 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111028

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705915

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111028

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705915 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990529

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB