Global Patent Index - EP 0939700 B1

EP 0939700 B1 2001-02-28 - STACKING LOGISTICS FOR A PRINTING MACHINE

Title (en)

STACKING LOGISTICS FOR A PRINTING MACHINE

Title (de)

STAPELLOGISTIK EINER DRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

LOGISTIQUE D'EMPILAGE POUR MACHINE A IMPRIMER

Publication

EP 0939700 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948689 A

Priority

  • DE 9702519 W
  • DE 19644942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19644942A1] The invention relates to stacking logistics for a printing machine to print the front side of sheet and the reverse side of a sheet. The aim of the invention is to create stacking logistics for a printing machine whereby the front side of a sheet is printed first, followed by the reverse side of a sheet. According to the invention, this is achieved by putting the stacks on conveyor trolleys assigned to a common stacking plane and placing a cantilever arm with a vertical drive mechanism in the side areas of the feeder stack and the exit stack on both sides, symmetrical to the machine's longitudinal axis and locating it below the respective assigned conveyor trolley.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42256 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42264 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19644942 A1 19980430; EP 0939700 A1 19990908; EP 0939700 B1 20010228; WO 9818627 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703077

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101028

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101028

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703077 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000425

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990529

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB