Global Patent Index - EP 0939702 B1

EP 0939702 B1 2001-02-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING SHEETS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING SHEETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON BOGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0939702 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97949862 A

Priority

  • DE 9702523 W
  • DE 19644946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19644946A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for conveying sheets in a sheet-fed printing press. The invention provides a method and a device to convey sheets unmarked on their printing surfaces by means of conveyor and/or positioning element even when the sheet is immediately run through the printing press a second time. According to the invention, this is performed in that the sheet to be printed is exclusively grabbed by a gripping edge during its trajectory (conveyance and positioning).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19644946 A1 19980430; EP 0939702 A1 19990908; EP 0939702 B1 20010228; WO 9818628 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703079

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101028

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101028

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091022

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703079 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000425

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990529

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB