Global Patent Index - EP 0939738 B1

EP 0939738 B1 2001-04-11 - SHEET FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

SHEET FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON BOGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0939738 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948692 A

Priority

  • DE 9702525 W
  • DE 19644944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19644944A1] The invention relates to a device for feeding sheets from a sheet pile to a sheet conveyor drum of a printing machine. The invention seeks to create a device to feed sheets with high feeding performance and low dynamic load. According to the invention, this is performed in that a conveyor element is placed above the sheet pile, configured as a suction box and connected to a lever mechanism, grabs the respective top sheet on the sheet pile, separates the sheet from the sheet pile and conveys the sheet across a feed table to lay marks; and in that, underneath the plane of the feed table, a pre-gripper, configured as an oscillating suction element, grabs the sheet to be conveyed, accelerates its conveyance and delivers the sheet to the sheet conveyer drum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/05 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/0833 (2013.01); B41F 21/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19644944 A1 19980430; EP 0939738 A1 19990908; EP 0939738 B1 20010411; WO 9818704 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091028

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703364

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000904

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990529

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB