Global Patent Index - EP 0939842 B1

EP 0939842 B1 2002-09-04 - A MULTILAYER HEADBOX FOR A PAPERMAKING MACHINE

Title (en)

A MULTILAYER HEADBOX FOR A PAPERMAKING MACHINE

Title (de)

MEHRSCHICHTENSTOFFAUFLAUF FÜR EINE PAPIERMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CAISSE DE TETE MULTICOUCHE DESTINEE A UNE MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 0939842 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97927534 A

Priority

  • SE 9700921 W
  • SE 9602347 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747804A1] A multilayer headbox for a papermaking machine which comprises a slice chamber having an upstream inlet and a downstream outlet. A tube bank comprising a plurality of straight tubes is located upstream of the slice chamber. In the slice chamber, at least one machine-wide separator vane is subdividing the slice chamber for the production of multilayered fibrous webs. The separator vane may be a tapered glass fiber reinforced epoxy resin vane or composed of an upstream steel section of constant thickness and a downstream tapered section of glass fiber reinforced epoxy resin. The separator vane has a stiffness, which for at least 70 % of its length is higher than the stiffness of a 1 mm thick reference sheet of a material having a modulus of elasticity of 2100 MPa. In the slice chamber, there is also a plurality of machine-wide turbulence generating elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/006 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747804 A1 19971218; AT 223534 T 20020915; DE 69715236 D1 20021010; DE 69715236 T2 20030522; DE 69715236 T3 20061214; EP 0939842 A1 19990908; EP 0939842 B1 20020904; EP 0939842 B2 20060628; JP 3194967 B2 20010806; JP H11514050 A 19991130; KR 20000010759 A 20000225; SE 506931 C2 19980302; SE 9602347 D0 19960612; SE 9602347 L 19971213

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170528

2017-07-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 223534 T

- Effective date: 20170529

2017-06-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170528

2017-05-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715236

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: VALMET AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Document: AT 223534 T

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SUNDSVALL, SE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20140317

2014-04-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: VALMET AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-03-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Effective date: 20140102

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Document: AT 223534 T

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VALMET AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AB, KARLSTAD, SE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20130828

2013-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20130709

2013-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715236

- Representative's name: LORENZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-06-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130509 AND 20130515

2013-05-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: METSO PAPER SWEDEN AKTIEBOLAG, SE

- Effective date: 20130404

2006-06-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2003-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715236 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223534 T 20020915

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARALDSSON, N., ULF, A.

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LINDEN, ANDERS, T.

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLERELID, INGVAR, B., E.

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TOERNEFALK-SVANQVIST, LOUISE, M.

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARALDSSON, N., ULF, A.

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LINDEN, ANDERS, T.

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLERELID, INGVAR, B., E.

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TOERNEFALK-SVANQVIST, LOUISE, M.

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010803

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT SE