Global Patent Index - EP 0939875 B1

EP 0939875 B1 2001-12-12 - BOTTLE TOP

Title (en)

BOTTLE TOP

Title (de)

FLASCHENKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE DE BOUTEILLE

Publication

EP 0939875 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945843 A

Priority

  • DE 19648440 A
  • EP 9705699 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19648440C1] The half-shells (1) are joined together in a plane at right angles to the cap surface. The lateral recess contains two holes (3) accommodating a folding handle, while other holes (5) accommodate screws holding the shells together. A fixing device (2) such as a screw thread is included, for securing to the bottle. The cap can be prevented from rolling or turning, and a movable hook can also be included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/06 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0308 (2013.01); F17C 2209/228 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2223/035 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19648440 C1 19980326; AT 210796 T 20011215; EP 0939875 A1 19990908; EP 0939875 B1 20011212; ES 2169879 T3 20020716; TW 350016 B 19990111; WO 9823895 A1 19980604; ZA 9709234 B 19980511

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161016

2017-10-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705811

2017-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-06-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151016

2016-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210796 T

- Effective date: 20151016

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111017

2012-10-17 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20120611

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-04-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2012-04-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2006-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-03-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2006-03-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2005-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-06-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-05-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-01-16 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-11-21 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MESSER GRIESHEIM G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2002-12-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: L AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L ETUDE ET L EX

2002-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH,FRANKFURT AIRPORT CENTER 1, C9, HUGO-ECKENER-RING,60547 FRANKFURT (DE) -DANN IN- MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH,FRITZ-KLATTE-STRASSE 6,65933 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: L AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L ETUDE ET L EX

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-10-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169879 T3

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705811 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210796 T 20011215

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010129

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE