Global Patent Index - EP 0939881 B1

EP 0939881 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE TRAJECTORY OF A PROJECTILE OF A GUN, A MORTAR OR A ROCKET LAUNCHER OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CORRECTING THE TRAJECTORY OF A PROJECTILE OF A GUN, A MORTAR OR A ROCKET LAUNCHER OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FLUGBAHNKORREKTUR EINE GESCHOSSES EINES GESCHÜTZES, EINES MÖRSERS ODER RAKETENWERFERS ODER DESGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CORRECTION DE LA TRAJECTOIRE D'UN PROJECTILE TIRE PAR UN CANON, UN MORTIER, UN LANCE-ROQUETTES OU SIMILAIRE

Publication

EP 0939881 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97927216 A

Priority

  • FI 9700397 W
  • FI 962545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748963A1] The invention relates to a method for correcting the trajectory of a projectile (5) of a gun, a mortar or a rocket launcher or the like firearm. The method comprises a step of determining the site coordinates of a firing position (2) and a scouted target (4) on a map and of using e.g. a compass for determining the bearing from the firing position (2) to the target (4) at the accuracy of a few degrees. The direction of fire of a firearm (1) is aimed at a desired strike point (P1) and an indicator projectile (5) corresponding to a live explosive projectile in terms of its flying characteristics is fired at such an elevation that with standard atmosphere, i.e. without disturbance factors, the strike is obtained at the distance of the desired strike point (P1). A receiver included in an electronic unit (8) incorporated in or released from the indicator projectile (5) is used to receive a spotting signal transmitted by an external spotting system, e.g. a GPS-system (6), for determining a real strike point (P2). A transmitter included in the electronic unit is used to transmit the site coordinates of the strike (P2) to a receiving unit (3) in the firing position and the elevation and bearing of the firearm (1) are corrected on the basis of a difference between the hypothetical (P1) and real (P2) sites of the indicator projectile or the electronic unit released therefrom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748963 A1 19971224; DE 69717488 D1 20030109; DE 69717488 T2 20030703; EP 0939881 A1 19990908; EP 0939881 B1 20021127; FI 962545 A0 19960619; FI 98957 B 19970530; FI 98957 C 19970910

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110619

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070619

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060619

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060620

2006-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060619

2005-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050516

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717488 20030109

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990119

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE