Global Patent Index - EP 0940192 A3

EP 0940192 A3 2000-11-02 - Apparatus for cleaning of containers and use of such apparatus

Title (en)

Apparatus for cleaning of containers and use of such apparatus

Title (de)

Behälterreinigungsvorrichtung und Verwendung einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage de conteneurs et utilisation d'un tel appareil

Publication

EP 0940192 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200664 A

Priority

DK 30398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940192A2] The invention relates to an apparatus for cleaning primarily the inner of containers. The apparatus comprises a foremost carriage provided with means in the form of rotating brushes and spraying pipes for cleaning of the inner of containers. The carriage is moved forward by means of wheels mounted on the carriage. Maintaining the carriage in an initial direction takes place by means of jaw-tongs mechanisms extending behind the carriage in a vertical plane and which preferably are supported by wheels. The jaw-tongs mechanisms have great rigidity in lateral direction so that the risk is very small that the carriage deviates from its course. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/087; B08B 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/087 (2006.01); B08B 9/093 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/093 (2013.01); B08B 9/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940192 A2 19990908; EP 0940192 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020613

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010501

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 08B 9/087 A, 7B 08B 9/093 B

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI