Global Patent Index - EP 0940202 A3

EP 0940202 A3 2000-08-16 - Process for mechanical riveting

Title (en)

Process for mechanical riveting

Title (de)

Nietverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de rivetage

Publication

EP 0940202 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98670001 A

Priority

PT 944998 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940202A2] This utility model refers to a process for mechanical riveting whose evident object consists in allowing the definitive mechanical connection and fixing of parts and pieces, for instance hinges for hinged ladders, in a form that dismisses the means hitherto known and used in the art. The fixing by this mechanical riveting process of, for instance, hinge (1) for hinged ladders consists in specially reamed recesses or drillings (3) made out in the inner parts (2) in a number depending from the applications and respective loads at stake, and in mechanical deformations or protrusions (5) made out by pressures exerted from outside upon the ends (4) of the outer parts of the connection to be established, in order to provoke the penetration of said deformations or protrusions (5) into said reamings (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/02 (2006.01); E06C 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/02 (2013.01); E06C 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 4344921 A1 19950706 - RAUSCHENBERGER METALLWAREN GMB [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940202 A2 19990908; EP 0940202 A3 20000816; PT 9449 T 19990930; PT 9449 U 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060314

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040512

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 15/02 A, 7E 06C 7/50 B, 7B 21D 39/04 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI