Global Patent Index - EP 0940203 A3

EP 0940203 A3 2000-10-04 - Hand riveting tool for blind rivets

Title (en)

Hand riveting tool for blind rivets

Title (de)

Hand-Blindnietzange

Title (fr)

Outil de rivetage à main pour rivets aveugles

Publication

EP 0940203 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104126 A

Priority

DE 19809354 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940203A2] The tongs have two grip levers (3,4) and traction element (10). A connecting rod drive (7) with variable transmission ratio is positioned between the traction element and the first grip lever. The ratio drops continuously from an initial position, in which the first lever is at maximum distance to the second lever, and an end position, in which the first lever is close to the second one. The drive has a pivoted intermediate lever, connected to the traction element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 15/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/04 (2006.01); B21J 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 15/386 (2013.01); B21J 15/043 (2013.01); B21J 15/326 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5373 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940203 A2 19990908; EP 0940203 A3 20001004; DE 19809354 A1 19990909; US 6021553 A 20000208

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI