Global patent index - EP 0940226 A3

EP 0940226 A3 2001-01-10 - Tensioning tool

Title (en)

Tensioning tool

Title (de)

Spannwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de tension

Publication

EP 0940226 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104128 A

Priority

DE 19809288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940226A2] The tool is esp. for the tensioning of a tent awning on support frames of camping houses. The edge of the awning is held between clamping faces of the tool. The clamping faces are connected to a lever arm, to support the tool on the frame when tightening the plastic awning. The lever arm length between arm grip and support point on the frame, and the distance between support point and clamp face are dimensioned, so that for tensioning of the awning, power intensification results, when the lever arm with clamp face is turned about the support point. The clamp face has a flat section for gentle holding of the awning surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 25/00; B25B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/02 (2006.01); B25B 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 25/00 (2013.01); B25B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940226 A2 19990908; EP 0940226 A3 20010110; DE 19809288 C1 19991111

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY FR LI LU NL

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH FR LI LU NL

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990709

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY FR LI LU NL

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI