Global Patent Index - EP 0940265 A3

EP 0940265 A3 2000-07-12 - Composition for forming an ink receiving layer and product using the same

Title (en)

Composition for forming an ink receiving layer and product using the same

Title (de)

Zusammensetzung zur Erzeugung einer Tintenempfangsschicht und daraus hergestelltes Produkt

Title (fr)

Composition pour la production d'une couche pour la réception d'encre et produit l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0940265 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301280 A

Priority

JP 6952398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940265A2] To provide an ink for forming a receiving layer, said ink containing an agent to enhance an ink-jet ink-receiving property and to confer a phosphorescent property, and products which use said ink. The ink for forming a receiving layer according to the present invention has a receiving property to ink-jet inks and a phosphorescent property and enable to print or coat on substrates and to print with ink-jet inks on said ink, phosphorescent pigments used in said ink for forming a receiving layer being commercial pigments such as an N noctilucent phosphorescent pigment and an S noctilucent phosphorescent pigment, average particle size of said phosphorescent pigments being 0.5-50 mu m, most preferably 8-25 mu m. Water-absorptive or water-absorbing organic fillers or inorganic fillers can be mixed to said ink.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); C09D 11/02 (2014.01); C09D 11/037 (2014.01); C09D 11/322 (2014.01); C09D 11/38 (2014.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940265 A2 19990908; EP 0940265 A3 20000712; EP 0940265 B1 20041222; CN 1190468 C 20050223; CN 1235179 A 19991117; DE 69922721 D1 20050127; DE 69922721 T2 20051201; HK 1023590 A1 20051007; JP H11246810 A 19990914; SG 80018 A1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100223

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100223

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-12-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922721 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKADA, NAOTO C/O TEIKOKU PRINTING INKS MFG.CO.LTD

1999-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KATO, CHIKAKO C/O TEIKOKU PRINTING INKS MFG.CO.LT

1999-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: URANAKA, REIKO C/O TEIKOKU PRINTING INKS MFG.CO

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI