Global Patent Index - EP 0940466 A3

EP 0940466 A3 2000-09-06 - Method of refining waste oil

Title (en)

Method of refining waste oil

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Raffination von Altöl

Title (fr)

Procédé de raffinage d'huile usée

Publication

EP 0940466 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104198 A

Priority

GB 9804481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940466A2] A method of refining waste oil containing contaminants and water comprising the steps of contacting the waste oil with an aliphatic solvent to form a waste oil/aliphatic solvent mixture, and in a treatment vessel (11) separating the mixture into three phases, namely a bottom phase (I) comprising predominantly water, an intermediate phase (II) comprising predominantly residuum containing contaminants and a top phase (III) comprising predominantly an oil/aliphatic solvent solution. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 175/00; B01D 1/30; C10G 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 21/00 (2006.01); C10G 21/14 (2006.01); C10G 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 21/28 (2013.01); C10G 21/006 (2013.01); C10G 21/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940466 A2 19990908; EP 0940466 A3 20000906; GB 2335436 A 19990922; GB 2335436 B 20020515; GB 9804481 D0 19980429

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010212

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 175/00 A, 7C 10G 21/00 B, 7B 01D 1/30 B

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI