Global Patent Index - EP 0940500 A3

EP 0940500 A3 2000-12-20 - Twin-wire former

Title (en)

Twin-wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsiebformer

Title (fr)

Section de formage à deux toiles

Publication

EP 0940500 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101196 A

Priority

DE 19809480 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940500A2] In the double fourdrinier assembly, where a fiber suspension pulp is converted into a paper or cardboard web, the lifting mechanism (23) is a single lifting system for the upper fourdrinier (20) and to grip the common carrier (22) for the water extraction box (19) and the entry roller (16). The lifting movement alters the wedge angle (k) of the entry between the fourdriniers, and separates the upper (20) and the lower (11) fourdriniers. An exit roller (17) on a swing axis (25) for the upper fourdrinier (20) also separates the fourdriniers (11,20). The additional roller swing axis (25) comes into effect after an increase in the entry wedge angle (k). When the upper fourdrinier (20) is lifted, the carrier (22) is raised clear of the bearing of the operating swing axis (24). During the conversion of the pulp into a web, the carrier (22) is clear of the additional swing axis (25). At the end of the double fourdrinier zone, a separating suction unit (15) is within the loop of the lower fourdrinier (11), with an upwards convex sieve surface. The suction unit can also be mounted to the upper fourdrinier assembly. In another form, the carrier is divided into pivoting entry and exit sections, interconnected by a linkage. During water extraction from the pulp, the entry section is supported on the operating swing axis, parallel to the direction of fourdrinier travel. The exit section is durably supported by the fixed swing axis. A gap is between the two carrier sections, which is bridged by a limit when the entry wedge angle is increased and the upper fourdrinier is lifted away from the lower fourdrinier and the carrier is lifted clear of the operating swing axis. The linkage is at least close to the bisection between the adjacent paths of the upper fourdrinier movement. The carrier can also be divided into a swing entry section and a rigid exit section, coupled together by straps which rest on supports during normal working. The entry section can swing in the straps, to alter the entry wedge angle, where the straps swing at the rigid exit section, After movement, the swing entry section can be coupled rigidly to the straps by limits, and the upper fourdrinier swings on the additional swing axis away from the lower fourdrinier. The operating swing axis (24) is located near the point where the fourdrinier moves away from the water extraction box. The operating swing axis can be at the fourdrinier running surface of the final bar (21) of the water extraction box (19). Or the operating swing axis is a single axis for the swing movement of the upper fourdrinier assembly, between the water extraction box (19) and the exit roller (17), or between the separating suction unit (15) and the exit roller (17). The double fourdrinier section can ride on slides, in relation to the machine frame, parallel to the line of fourdrinier travel and/or across it. The carrier (22) has two longitudinal carriers, linked together across the machine only by the water extraction box (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940500 A2 19990908; EP 0940500 A3 20001220; EP 0940500 B1 20050615; CA 2264998 A1 19990906; DE 19809480 A1 19990909; DE 19809480 B4 20070104; ES 2243020 T3 20051116; US 6214167 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912172

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120122

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120123

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-01-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243020 T3

2005-08-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912172 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI IT SE

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030317

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FI IT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI IT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI