Global Patent Index - EP 0940505 A3

EP 0940505 A3 2000-01-26 - Device for making a foundation pile in the ground

Title (en)

Device for making a foundation pile in the ground

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erstellen eines Grundelementes im Boden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire un élément de fondation dans le sol

Publication

EP 0940505 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103221 A

Priority

DE 29804010 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940505A2] The device comprises a core pipe (12) on which a pressure receiver (15) is arranged in the bottom region near the auger bit (13). The pressure of the hardenable suspension is determined by the pressure receiver during the feeding. The pressure receiver is connected to a control unit of the pump. The pressure of the hardenable suspension may be controlled and/or adjusted during feeding through the control unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/36; E02D 5/46; E02D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/36 (2006.01); E02D 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/36 (2013.01); E02D 5/46 (2013.01); E02D 2250/0038 (2013.01); E02D 2300/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804010 U1 19980625; EP 0940505 A2 19990908; EP 0940505 A3 20000126; EP 0940505 B1 20040915; ES 2229567 T3 20050416; US 6238142 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-15 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20081016

2005-08-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SOILMEC S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229567 T3

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910478 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02D 5/36 A, 7E 02D 5/46 B, 7E 02D 15/04 B

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI