Global Patent Index - EP 0940519 A3

EP 0940519 A3 2001-12-05 - Stratified structure, in particular for terrace roof

Title (en)

Stratified structure, in particular for terrace roof

Title (de)

Schichtaufbau insbesondere für ein Flachdach

Title (fr)

Structure stratiforme, en particulier pour toit plat

Publication

EP 0940519 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102895 A

Priority

DE 19809137 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940519A2] A mineral-containing material is used as the fire-retardant layer in a layer structure, especially for flat roofs, comprising a heat-insulating layer, a fire retardant layer and a liquid-proof layer. Independent claims are also included for: (1) a heat-insulating layer for this structure, which is firmly bonded to a fire retardant layer as defined above; and (2) a paste of mineral-containing material for production of the fire retardant layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 11/02; E04B 1/94; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940519 A2 19990908; EP 0940519 A3 20011205; DE 19809137 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011218

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990304

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 11/02 A, 7E 04D 13/16 B, 7E 04B 1/94 B

2001-01-31 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20000403

2001-01-31 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOETZ, PETER

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOETZ, PETER

1999-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOETZ, PETER

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990304