Global Patent Index - EP 0940520 A3

EP 0940520 A3 2001-01-03 - Drain for flat roof and flat roof with drain

Title (en)

Drain for flat roof and flat roof with drain

Title (de)

Flachdach-Wasserablauf und Flachdach mit einem Flachdach-Wasserablauf

Title (fr)

Drain pour toit plat et toit plat avec drain

Publication

EP 0940520 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104548 A

Priority

DE 19809488 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940520A2] The drain box (16) which is adjoined by a drain pipe (11) leading to a down pipe (12) has a non-sunken base section (17) and a sunken base section (19). The drain pipe (11) has fitting onto the sunken base section a downwardly aligned part (14) and an only slightly inclined pipe end (11') so that the diameter of the pipe end lies completely underneath the base section (17) which is not sunken. The diameter of the pipe end (11') pref. lies at least more than halfway below the sunken base section. The drain box is closed from the roof surface by a screen unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0431 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940520 A2 19990908; EP 0940520 A3 20010103; EP 0940520 B1 20030730; AT 246292 T 20030815; DE 19809488 A1 19990923; DE 19809488 C2 20020808; DK 0940520 T3 20031117

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170308

2017-10-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170331

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DK FI FR GB

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DK FI FR GB

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK FI FR GB

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI