Global patent index - EP 0940524 A3

EP 0940524 A3 2000-03-22 - Closure element for wall or ceiling coverings

Title (en)

Closure element for wall or ceiling coverings

Title (de)

Verschlusselement für Wand- oder Deckenverkleidungen

Title (fr)

Elément de fermeture pour revêtements muraux ou de plafond

Publication

EP 0940524 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103240 A

Priority

DE 19808852 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940524A2] The joint between the boards or panels (13.14) of wall and ceiling claddings is filled by a closure (10) where they would otherwise lock together with their tongue and groove profiles. It sits in place, in a snap fit, in the facing grooves (11,12) at the side edges of the boards (13,14). The joint closure (10) is of plastics or metal, and can be in a color matching the cladding boards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 19/02; F16L 3/123

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/00 (2006.01); E04F 19/02 (2006.01); F24F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 19/02 (2013.01); E04B 9/00 (2013.01); F24F 13/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 4406295 A1 19950511 - HOFFMANN DIETMAR [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940524 A2 19990908; EP 0940524 A3 20000322; DE 19808852 A1 19990909

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04F 19/02 A, 7F 16L 3/123 B

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI