Global Patent Index - EP 0940549 A3

EP 0940549 A3 2000-10-04 - Corner joint connector for welding hollow section members

Title (en)

Corner joint connector for welding hollow section members

Title (de)

Schweisseckverbinder von Hohlkammerprofilen

Title (fr)

Pièce d'assemblage d'angle pour relier par soudage deux profilés creux

Publication

EP 0940549 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101004 A

Priority

DE 19809482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940549A2] The welded corner fastener (10), for hollow chamber profiles, has a shaped body (11) fitted externally to the chamber corner, with a weldable connecting surface (13) at one end (11'). The other end (11) has an end section (14) which can be spread out laterally by a spreader (12). The spreader (12) has only a rotary adjustment, and is locked against unwanted reverse rotation when it has spread out the end section (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/972; E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/96 (2006.01); E06B 3/972 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9725 (2013.01); E06B 3/9608 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940549 A2 19990908; EP 0940549 A3 20001004; EP 0940549 B1 20050615; AT 298036 T 20050715; DE 19809482 A1 19990916; DE 19809482 C2 20000531; PL 196559 B1 20080131; PL 331662 A1 19990913

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-08-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS DIETER NIEMANN, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 59912173

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 59912173

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090118

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER

- Free text: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER#AM HUEGEL 17#50169 KERPEN-HORREM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NIEMANN, HANS DIETER#AM HUEGEL 17#50169 KERPEN-HORREM (DE)

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912173 P 20050721

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 3/972 A, 7E 06B 3/96 B

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI