Global patent index - EP 0940555 A3

EP 0940555 A3 2001-04-11 - Free-standing ladder

Title (en)

Free-standing ladder

Title (de)

Freistehende Leiter

Title (fr)

Echelle autonome

Publication

EP 0940555 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104445 A

Priority

DE 29803785 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940555A2] The ladder has stabilizers (2) connected by a rear cross bar (4) to form a stable triangle through longitudinal stays (3). The stabilizer fitment can be fitted to new or existing ladders. The stabilizers (2) are set V-shaped and can have wheels (5) or slide shoes. The stabilizers can have separately adjustable longitudinal stays. A handle (11) can be formed by an extension of the longitudinal stay. The ladder foot can have a single foot or separately adjustable feet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 1/20; E06C 1/397

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/20 (2006.01); E06C 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/397 (2013.01); E06C 1/20 (2013.01); E06C 7/423 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803785 U1 19981217; EP 0940555 A2 19990908; EP 0940555 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI