Global Patent Index - EP 0940565 A3

EP 0940565 A3 2000-03-01 - Water pump for the cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Water pump for the cooling circuit of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Wasserpumpe für den Kühlkreislauf einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Pompe à eau pour le circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0940565 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101947 A

Priority

DE 19809123 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940565A2] The water pump, for the coolant circuit of an internal combustion motor and especial in a vehicle, has a setting valve (5) in a pump housing (1) with an integrated rotary valve (6). The rotary valve (6) has a sleeve shape, with an axial collection opening (7) for the feed or delivery of the coolant to the suction or pressure side of the pump unit (3). Inlet or outlet openings (9) are in the peripheral wall of the pump housing (1) for connection to the coolant channel (8) to the radiator and for at least one further part-circuit. The rotary valve (6) has a control opening (13) in its peripheral wall with an opening width to give a link between the axial opening (7) and one of the inlet-outlet openings (9) or overlap two of them for a mixed effect. The pump housing (1) has connections for electrical power supply from the vehicle electrical system, and a data exchange connection, in a common housing (14) mounted to the pump housing (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 5/10; F01P 7/14; F04D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 5/02 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F01P 5/12 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/40 (2006.01); F16K 3/22 (2006.01); F16K 11/076 (2006.01); F16K 31/04 (2006.01); F16K 31/68 (2006.01); F16K 31/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0022 (2013.01); F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F01P 7/14 (2013.01); F04D 15/0066 (2013.01); F04D 29/406 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); F01P 2070/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940565 A2 19990908; EP 0940565 A3 20000301; EP 0940565 B1 20041006; DE 19809123 A1 19990916; DE 19809123 B4 20051201; JP 3338954 B2 20021028; JP H11336547 A 19991207; US 6257177 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041006

2005-01-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910681 P 20041111

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030722

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI