Global Patent Index - EP 0940580 A3

EP 0940580 A3 2000-06-07 - Transportable air compressor

Title (en)

Transportable air compressor

Title (de)

Verfahrbarer Luftkompressor

Title (fr)

Compresseur d'air transportable

Publication

EP 0940580 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103863 A

Priority

DE 29803475 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940580A2] The mobile air compressor has a wheeled base unit (1) and standing feet (4). The handle (5) is arranged at a distance above the base unit. There are also an air bottle (6), a compressor unit (7), a motor unit (8) and a connector (9). The air bottle is in a standing position relative to the base unit. The compressor unit is alongside the air bottle, preferably on the side facing away from the running axle (2) or on the side facing towards it. The motor unit may also be alongside the air bottle and preferably under the compressor unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 35/06 (2006.01); F04B 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 35/06 (2013.01); F04B 41/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803475 U1 19980528; EP 0940580 A2 19990908; EP 0940580 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI