Global Patent Index - EP 0940629 A3

EP 0940629 A3 2001-01-10 - Lighting device

Title (en)

Lighting device

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage

Publication

EP 0940629 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100988 A

Priority

GB 9804377 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940629A2] A light fitting (40) comprises an attachment portion (70) and at least one and preferably a plurality of connector portions (50,52,54) to which conventional light bulbs may be connected. The connector portions (50,52,54) are provided with electrical power through wires (60) disposed internally of the fitting (40) which are in turn connected to an electrical connector (74) provided proximate the attachment portion (70). In use, the attachment portion (70) of the fitting (40) is adapted for attachment to an existing but empty light bulb fitting (12) on a ceiling which normally receives a conventional light bulb. Simultaneously with the attachment of the light fitting to the light bulb fitting (12), electrical connection is made between said light bulb fitting (12) and the electrical connector (74) within the light fitting (40) thus providing same with power. A simple and safe means of connecting chandeliers and the like to existing light bulb fittings results.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/00; F21V 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940629 A2 19990908; EP 0940629 A3 20010110; GB 9804377 D0 19980422

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 19/00 A, 7F 21V 21/02 B

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI