Global Patent Index - EP 0940633 A3

EP 0940633 A3 2000-11-22 - Extraction hood for kitchens

Title (en)

Extraction hood for kitchens

Title (de)

Dunstabzugshaube

Title (fr)

Hotte d'évacuation de fumée pour cuisine

Publication

EP 0940633 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104376 A

Priority

DE 19809559 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940633A2] The vapor extraction hood has two radial fans (14,16) and two flaps (60,62) which pivot on vertical swing axes (61,63), and have air guide extensions (66,68). The flaps (60,62) are moved between a setting where air is extracted to the rear of the shrouding hood as an exhaust, or to the front for air recirculation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940633 A2 19990908; EP 0940633 A3 20001122; EP 0940633 B1 20030702; DE 19809559 A1 19990909; ES 2201582 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160304

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906137

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906137

- Effective date: 20150402

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080305

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080304

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080305

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080305

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201582 T3

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906137 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI