Global Patent Index - EP 0940640 A3

EP 0940640 A3 2000-10-11 - A cover for a combustion boiler and a boiler provided with such a cover

Title (en)

A cover for a combustion boiler and a boiler provided with such a cover

Title (de)

Gehäuse für Verbrennungskessel und Kessel mit einem solchen Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour chaudière à combustion et chaudière avec un tel boîtier

Publication

EP 0940640 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104382 A

Priority

IT BO980130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940640A2] A combustion boiler is provided with a central body (2) defined by a combustion chamber (9), a heat exchanger (10) and a hood (11) for the aspiration of fumes emitted by the said combustion, and is housed in a cover (3) provided with first and second self-supporting half-shells (19, 20) made from plastics material and connectable to each other to form the cover (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940640 A2 19990908; EP 0940640 A3 20001011; IT 1299881 B1 20000404; IT BO980130 A1 19990906; IT BO980130 D0 19980305

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI