Global Patent Index - EP 0940734 B1

EP 0940734 B1 2002-09-04 - Striking clock with device for disconnecting the striking mechanism

Title (en)

Striking clock with device for disconnecting the striking mechanism

Title (de)

Schlagwerksuhr mit Vorrichtung zum Abschalten des Schlagwerkes

Title (fr)

Horloge avec sonnerie munie d'un dispositif pour déconnecter la sonnerie

Publication

EP 0940734 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102186 A

Priority

DE 29802837 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940734A1] The device has a switch off device (60) for time-wise switching off of the count strike mechanism. The fall count of the strike mechanism falls with an axially sprung deflectable pin (35) of a key arm to an hour step (27) and is set in operation by a trigger lever actuated by a trigger cam of the minute hand. The switch off device (60) has a locking disk which is driven by the clockwork and which rotates once in 24 hours. The disk has a sector type locking cam and is scanned by a lever which is in operative connection with the trigger lever via a locking lever. The trigger lever alternately locks and releases the striking mechanism. The hour step (27) has a stroke curve arranged laterally in the contact region of the axially deflected pin (35). The curve (90) extends from the lowest radial step (N) of the hour step to radial steps of those hour strike counts at which the function of the striking mechanism is released again.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 21/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29802837 U1 19980416; EP 0940734 A1 19990908; EP 0940734 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902511

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902511 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2000-05-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI